U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30578
  • Case Name: Christopher Paul Seitz and Katie Lynn Seitz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Dismiss Case]
November, 2017
  • November 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • November 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment of Installment Fee (Final-Chapter 7)]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.