U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07020
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. C & M Ford Sales, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • November 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • November 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • November 02, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.