U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07019
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. RDO Truck Center Co
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • December 20, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 20, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • November 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • November 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.