U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07021
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Med Park Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.