U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30588
  • Case Name: Amy Mae Wolf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.