U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30587
  • Case Name: Trevor Monilaws
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Final Account]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Final Report]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Update Claim]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order (Generic)]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection to Claim]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Assets]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sale Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Statement of Intent]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • October 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.