U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30604
  • Case Name: Shanna Marie Seil
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2017
  • December 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.