U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30608
  • Case Name: Jay H Schmallen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amend]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reduce Time]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reduce Time]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amend]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2018
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sell]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sell]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Abandonment]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • December 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.