U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30612
  • Case Name: Scott D Syverson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Tax Documents]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.