U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30611
  • Case Name: Kriss Domier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
January, 2019
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Turnover Property]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Turnover Property]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • October 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.