U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30618
  • Case Name: Dorothy Eileen Lowe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2017
  • October 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.