U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07022
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Collection Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • November 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • October 13, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.