U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30625
  • Case Name: Steven F. Mohr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Application (21 day notice)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [XGeneric Application (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
September, 2018
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdraw As Attorney]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdraw As Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summons Service Executed]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Contempt]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.