U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-30542
  • Case Name: Kent McDougall and Erica M. McDougall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Final Account]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Final Report]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Amended Order]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Administrative Expenses]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1) and (d)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Document]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Administrative Expenses]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Assets]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Turnover Property]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
February, 2018
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Amended Schedules]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Sell]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BAP re: Appeal]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Leave to Appeal]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Compensation]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Document]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order on Generic Motion]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Compensation]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Response]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.