U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30626
  • Case Name: Matthew Lee Stroh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.