U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30634
  • Case Name: Carrie Lynn Garland
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.