U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07023
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Peluso
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [District Court re: Appeal]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
January, 2019
  • January 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Redacted Transcript]
  • January 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Misc Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript Ordered re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appellant Designation]
  • November 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio CD Request]
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal]
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • October 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 13, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • November 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 23, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.