U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07024
  • Case Name: Doeling v. NC Financial Solutions of Illinois, LLC, d/b/a Net
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • October 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.