U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30666
  • Case Name: Curtis Lyman Reisnour
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Misc Notice]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reduce Time]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reduce Time]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Brief]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • January 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Intent]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.