U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30671
  • Case Name: Tayler M. Billings and DeAnne Billings
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2018
  • February 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
November, 2017
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.