U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30674
  • Case Name: Parker Lee Boyce Entze
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2018
  • February 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
November, 2017
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.