U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30689
  • Case Name: David Lindberg Brunsvold
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2018
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer]
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.