U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30694
  • Case Name: Shari Deanne Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2018
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.