U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30702
  • Case Name: Steven D. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2018
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.