U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07025
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Keeley et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Set(Motion)]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Order]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • January 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.