U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30718
  • Case Name: Joan Marie Poole
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismissing Case]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Comply]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objecting to Discharge]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.