U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07027
  • Case Name: United Savings Credit Union v. Kleven
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.