U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07026
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Obritsch et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • December 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • December 18, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.