U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07028
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Blomquist et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • July 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • July 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • July 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • July 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • July 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • July 22, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • July 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • July 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • May 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • May 12, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Intervene]
  • April 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order to Set Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • March 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • March 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • January 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Substitute Attorney ]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reduce Time]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • January 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.