U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07029
  • Case Name: Norberg v. Knorr Norberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • August 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
  • August 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • July 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • June 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Oral Argument]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.