U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30721
  • Case Name: Connie L Jenkinson and Jerome E Jenkinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case under 521(i)]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reduce Time]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.