U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30725
  • Case Name: Crystal M Hoffert and Dillon E Hoffert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Unclaimed Funds Paid]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustees Report]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
December, 2017
  • December 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.