U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30730
  • Case Name: Amy L. Speidel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2018
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [UST Statement of Declination]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • December 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.