U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30731
  • Case Name: Susan Rae Sommerfelt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.