U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-30051
  • Case Name: James Antognazzi
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2018
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Unclaimed Funds Paid]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustees Report]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.