U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07004
  • Case Name: Schmallen v. United States of America (IRS)
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • March 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • February 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stay]
  • January 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.