U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07003
  • Case Name: Kleven v. United States of America (IRS)
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • March 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • February 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.