U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30020
  • Case Name: Roger Jahner and Renae Jahner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • August 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • July 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule J]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule I]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule D]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule A/B]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • March 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Misc Notice]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • February 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.