U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07005
  • Case Name: Velde v. Baumstark Braaten, P.C.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • March 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • March 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • March 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • March 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.