U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30023
  • Case Name: Duane Donald Sevik
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • August 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Cure Order]
  • August 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Cure Order]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.