U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07006
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Sadowsky
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • March 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Show Cause]
  • February 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Contempt]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.