U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07007
  • Case Name: Velde v. O'Toole
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • May 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • April 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • March 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.