U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07008
  • Case Name: Velde v. Harney Management Partners LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • February 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • February 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.