U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30048
  • Case Name: Nicole Marie Baggenstoss
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • February 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.