U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30051
  • Case Name: Donna Momerak
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2018
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee (Final-Chapter 7)]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • February 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.