U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07010
  • Case Name: Ahlgren v. Mohr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • September 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • August 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • March 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.