U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07011
  • Case Name: Velde v. Lakes Area Landscaping LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • April 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • March 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.