U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30064
  • Case Name: Kimberly Puppe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
August, 2018
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
February, 2018
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.