U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30073
  • Case Name: Darrin Michael Dietrich and Brittany Joy Dietrich
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
September, 2018
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Turnover Property]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continue Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Turnover Property]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Turnover Property]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.