U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30078
  • Case Name: Corey Lynn Dalzell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • August 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • May 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2020
  • March 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update Claim]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.